KS SB93 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Public Health and Welfare; Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Pending: Senate Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing restrictions on the use of step therapy protocols by health insurance plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing restrictions on the use of step therapy protocols by health insurance plans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-04SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Public Health and Welfare; Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-02-25SenateSenate Hearing: Monday, February 25, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N
2019-02-18SenateSenate Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N - CANCELED
2019-02-06SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-02-05SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback