KS SB91 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 13, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 13, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 91 by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development - Providing liability protection for businesses, municipalities and educational institutions that participate in high school work-based learning programs and providing that schools are responsible for injuries to students participating in such programs.
Title
House Substitute for SB 91 by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development - Providing liability protection for businesses, municipalities and educational institutions that participate in high school work-based learning programs and providing that schools are responsible for injuries to students participating in such programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 2 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 116 Nay: 0 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 34 Nay: 5 (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 116 Nay: 0 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 34 Nay: 5 (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 13, 2022 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 2 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to not adopt CCR and appoint a new conf. comm. Motion failed. |
2022-03-31 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 116 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-31 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Senator Erickson and Senator Dietrich are appointed to replace Senator Olson and Senator Steffen on the Conference Committee |
2021-05-07 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Tarwater, Representative Long and Representative Clayton appointed as conferees |
2021-05-07 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Olson , Senator Steffen and Senator Holland as conferees |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2021-04-08 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2021-04-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2021-04-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2021-04-06 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations and re-referred to Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-31 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-29 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2021-03-17 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 17, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2021-03-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2021-03-03 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 34 Nay: 5 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 10, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Introduced |