KS SB91 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Select Committee on Federal Tax Code Implementation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the golden years homestead property tax freeze act providing refund for certain increases in residential property taxes and allowing homestead property tax refund for renters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the golden years homestead property tax freeze act providing refund for certain increases in residential property taxes and allowing homestead property tax refund for renters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateSenate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Select Committee on Federal Tax Code Implementation
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2019-02-14SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 14, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-02-05SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2019-02-04SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback