KS SB90 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Extending the tax credit under the center for entrepreneurship act to financial institutions and increasing the annual tax credit limit for all contributors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending the tax credit under the center for entrepreneurship act to financial institutions and increasing the annual tax credit limit for all contributors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 2 (Y: 122 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2019
2019-04-02SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019
2019-03-26HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 2
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-03-15HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2019-03-12HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 112-N
2019-02-28HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2019-02-28HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-02-27SenateSenate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2019-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce
2019-02-13SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-02-05SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Commerce
2019-02-04SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback