KS SB90 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the tax credit under the center for entrepreneurship act to financial institutions and increasing the annual tax credit limit for all contributors.
Title
Extending the tax credit under the center for entrepreneurship act to financial institutions and increasing the annual tax credit limit for all contributors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 2 (Y: 122 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 2 |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2019-03-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2019-03-12 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2019-02-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2019-02-28 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 548-S |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate Introduced |