KS SB88 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-14 - Senate Hearing continuation: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 548-S
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-14 - Senate Hearing continuation: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 548-S
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the statewide election of commissioners of the state corporation commission, establishing the utilities regulation division in the office of the attorney general, requiring such division to represent and protect the collective interests of utility customers in utility rate-related proceedings and exempting the state corporation commission from the open meetings act.
Title
Providing for the statewide election of commissioners of the state corporation commission, establishing the utilities regulation division in the office of the attorney general, requiring such division to represent and protect the collective interests of utility customers in utility rate-related proceedings and exempting the state corporation commission from the open meetings act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing continuation: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 548-S |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 13, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 548-S |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Utilities |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Senate Introduced |