KS SB86 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 22, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 22, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Kansas extraordinary utility costs loan deposit program and the Kansas economic recovery loan deposit program and amending the city utility low-interest loan program by providing for electronic repayment of loans, cash basis exception, payment frequency, loan security and an ending date for making loans.
Title
Establishing the Kansas extraordinary utility costs loan deposit program and the Kansas economic recovery loan deposit program and amending the city utility low-interest loan program by providing for electronic repayment of loans, cash basis exception, payment frequency, loan security and an ending date for making loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 36 Nay: 2 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 117 Nay: 6 (Y: 117 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 117 Nay: 6 (Y: 117 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 22, 2021 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 36 Nay: 2 |
2021-04-09 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 117 Nay: 6 |
2021-04-09 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2021-04-07 | House | House Representative Kelly, Representative Hoheisel, and Representative Xu are appointed to replace Representative S. Johnson, Representative Croft, and Representative Neighbor on the Conference Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative S. Johnson, Representative Croft and Representative Neighbor appointed as conferees |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Fagg and Senator Pittman as conferees |
2021-03-24 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance and Pensions |
2021-03-15 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 15, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2021-03-02 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance and Pensions |
2021-03-02 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 11, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Financial Institutions; Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate Introduced |