KS SB84 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 12, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 12, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for Substitute for SB 84 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Authorizing sports wagering under the Kansas expanded lottery act and historical horse race machines under the Kansas parimutuel racing act.
Title
House Substitute for Substitute for SB 84 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Authorizing sports wagering under the Kansas expanded lottery act and historical horse race machines under the Kansas parimutuel racing act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 21 Nay: 13 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 73 Nay: 49 (Y: 73 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 63 Nay: 49 (Y: 63 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed - Yea: 56 Nay: 56 (Y: 56 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2022-03-30 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 88 Nay: 36 (Y: 88 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Awerkamp was rejected - Yea: 48 Nay: 71 (Y: 48 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-03-30 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Landwehr was rejected - Yea: 56 Nay: 66 (Y: 56 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 26 Nay: 12 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 73 Nay: 49 (Y: 73 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 63 Nay: 49 (Y: 63 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed - Yea: 56 Nay: 56 (Y: 56 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2022-03-30 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 88 Nay: 36 (Y: 88 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Awerkamp was rejected - Yea: 48 Nay: 71 (Y: 48 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-03-30 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Landwehr was rejected - Yea: 56 Nay: 66 (Y: 56 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 26 Nay: 12 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 12, 2022 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 6, 2022 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 21 Nay: 13 |
2022-04-28 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 73 Nay: 49 |
2022-04-28 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2022-04-28 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2022-04-28 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Barker, Representative Arnberger and Representative Ruiz, L. appointed as second conferees |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Senator Olson, Senator Petersen and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as second conferees |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2022-04-01 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 63 Nay: 49 |
2022-04-01 | House | House Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed Yea: 56 Nay: 56 |
2022-04-01 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Senator Petersen is appointed to replace Senator Hilderbrand on the Conference Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Barker, Representative Arnberger and Representative Ruiz, L. appointed as conferees |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Olson , Senator Hilderbrand and Senator Faust-Goudeau as conferees |
2022-03-30 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 88 Nay: 36 |
2022-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Thomas was adopted |
2022-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Thomas |
2022-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Miller was adopted |
2022-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Miller |
2022-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Barker was adopted |
2022-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Barker |
2022-03-29 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs and referred to Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-17 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to recommend favorably for passage failed |
2021-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Woodard was rejected |
2021-03-30 | House | House Representative Arnberger raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane. |
2021-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Woodard |
2021-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Awerkamp was rejected Yea: 48 Nay: 71 |
2021-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Awerkamp |
2021-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Landwehr was rejected Yea: 56 Nay: 66 |
2021-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Landwehr |
2021-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Resman was adopted |
2021-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Resman |
2021-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2021-03-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-03-18 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 18, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2021-03-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-03-10 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 26 Nay: 12 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Claeys was rejected |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Claeys |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Dietrich was adopted |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Dietrich |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Thompson was rejected |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Thompson |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Hearing continuation: Thursday, February 11, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 10, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Hearing: (proponents) Wednesday, February 10, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate Introduced |