KS SB83 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the credit to the EMS revolving fund from district court fines, penalties or forfeitures.
Title
Increasing the credit to the EMS revolving fund from district court fines, penalties or forfeitures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb83/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb83_00_0000.pdf |