KS SB81 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the state corporation commission to provide the legislature with an annual report of the electric rates of electric public utilities in the region.
Title
Requiring the state corporation commission to provide the legislature with an annual report of the electric rates of electric public utilities in the region.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 11, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 548-S |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Utilities |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate Introduced |