KS SB79 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-20 - Senate Hearing: Monday, February 20, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-20 - Senate Hearing: Monday, February 20, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing counties to impose an earnings tax.
Title
Authorizing counties to impose an earnings tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 20, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Senate Introduced |