KS SB77 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 12, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the department for children and families to offer services to children with sexual behavior problems and to such child's family.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring the department for children and families to offer services to children with sexual behavior problems and to such child's family.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 12, 2019
2019-04-02SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019
2019-03-27SenateSenate Concurred with amendments; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-26HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2019-03-19HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
2019-03-18HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED
2019-02-28HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2019-02-28HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-02-27SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-12SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, February 12, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2019-02-04SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-01SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback