KS SB75 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - House Referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Substitute for SB 75 by Committee on Ways and Means - Appropriations for FY2019, FY 2020, FY 2021 and FY 2022 for various state agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substitute for SB 75 by Committee on Ways and Means - Appropriations for FY2019, FY 2020, FY 2021 and FY 2022 for various state agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 21 Nay: 18 (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-22HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-03-21SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 21 Nay: 18
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
2019-03-21SenateSenate Motion to postpone consideration to day certain. Motion not adopted.
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Denning was adopted
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Denning
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means
2019-03-12SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-02-01SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-31SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback