KS SB75 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-05 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, 05 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-05 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, 05 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Record requirements and civil penalties relating to sales of plastic bulk merchandise containers.
Title
Record requirements and civil penalties relating to sales of plastic bulk merchandise containers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 101 Nay: 18 (Y: 101 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, 05 April 2013 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 02, 2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 101 Nay: 18 |
2013-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2013-03-08 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2013-03-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2013-03-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 14, 2013, 8:30 AM Room 548-S |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senate Introduced |