KS SB74 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for joint liability for costs and sanctions in third-party funded litigation, requiring certain discovery disclosures and requiring payment of certain costs for nonparty subpoenas.
Title
Providing for joint liability for costs and sanctions in third-party funded litigation, requiring certain discovery disclosures and requiring payment of certain costs for nonparty subpoenas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 2, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Senate Introduced |