KS SB73 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-01 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-01 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Workers compensation: administration; administrative judge disqualification; notice; workplace health and safety program.
Title
Workers compensation: administration; administrative judge disqualification; notice; workplace health and safety program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 32 Nay: 8 (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2013-03-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-03-15 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2013-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2013-03-08 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 346-S -CANCELLED |
2013-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2013-02-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 32 Nay: 8 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was rejected |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator V. Schmidt |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 04, 2013, 8:30 AM Room 548-S |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senate Introduced |