KS SB70 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 22, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic liquor amendments relating to temporary permits, delivery of alcoholic liquors to consumers, common consumption areas and producer permits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic liquor amendments relating to temporary permits, delivery of alcoholic liquors to consumers, common consumption areas and producer permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 4 (Y: 119 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 5 (Y: 119 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 22, 2019
2019-05-01SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 12, 2019
2019-04-05SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 0
2019-04-05HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 4
2019-04-05HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2019-04-03HouseHouse Representative Clayton is appointed to replace Representative Ruiz, L. on the Conference Committee
2019-04-01HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative Barker, Representative Awerkamp and Representative Ruiz, L. appointed as conferees
2019-03-27SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Estes , Senator Olson and Senator Faust-Goudeau as conferees
2019-03-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 5
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2019-03-22HouseHouse Hearing: Friday, March 22, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
2019-03-14HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2019-03-14HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-03-13SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Bowers was withdrawn
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Bowers
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Estes was adopted
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Estes
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Estes was adopted
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Estes
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-25SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2019-02-13SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
2019-02-01SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2019-01-31SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb70/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb70_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb70_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb70_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb70_03_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb70_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190313145919_180078/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190327090909_985070/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190405110247_510685/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190405175916_887123/

Bill Comments

feedback