KS SB70 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Background checks and licensure of teachers; background checks for school employees with direct contact with students.
Title
Background checks and licensure of teachers; background checks for school employees with direct contact with students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 29 Nay: 10 (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected - Yea: 11 Nay: 26 (Y: 11 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected - Yea: 11 Nay: 26 (Y: 11 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2015-03-23 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education |
2015-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 18, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 112N |
2015-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 29 Nay: 10 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected Yea: 11 Nay: 26 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 10, 2015, 9:30 AM Room 118-N |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate Introduced |