KS SB7 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-25 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 25, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-25 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 25, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing income tax rates for resident individuals domiciled in a rural equity decline county.
Title
Reducing income tax rates for resident individuals domiciled in a rural equity decline county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-25 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 25, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Senate Prefiled for Introduction on Tuesday, January 3, 2023 |