KS SB7 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Moving the dates for school board officer elections and organizational meetings and amending the manner of submitting to voters proposed changes to a school district’s manner of election and voting plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Moving the dates for school board officer elections and organizational meetings and amending the manner of submitting to voters proposed changes to a school district’s manner of election and voting plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 37 Nay: 2 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseHouse Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Elections
2019-03-12HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 212-N
2019-02-28HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Elections
2019-02-28HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-02-27SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 37 Nay: 2
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-14SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government
2019-02-06SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 6, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 142-S
2019-01-15SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government
2019-01-14SenateSenate Introduced
2019-01-14SenateSenate Prefiled for Introduction on Friday, January 11, 2019

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback