KS SB69 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Substitute for SB 69 by Committee on Public Health and Welfare - KanCare process and contract requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substitute for SB 69 by Committee on Public Health and Welfare - KanCare process and contract requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 36 Nay: 4 (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04HouseHouse Died in House Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2017-03-24HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2017-03-23SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 36 Nay: 4
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pilcher-Cook was rejected
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pilcher-Cook
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator V. Schmidt
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator V. Schmidt
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2017-03-06SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
2017-02-23SenateSenate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2017-02-21SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2017-02-08SenateSenate Hearing continuation: Wednesday, February 08, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 118-N
2017-02-02SenateSenate Hearing continuation: Thursday, February 02, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 118-N
2017-01-31SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 118-N
2017-01-24SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2017-01-23SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback