KS SB69 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-02 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 02 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; vehicle registration and license plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; vehicle registration and license plates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-19 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 117 Nay: 6 (Y: 117 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-02SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 02 April 2013
2013-03-26SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 26, 2013
2013-03-19HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 117 Nay: 6
2013-03-18HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2013-03-13HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
2013-02-27HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 07, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
2013-02-14HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Transportation
2013-02-14HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2013-02-13SenateSenate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2013-02-07SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2013-02-01SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 06, 2013, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
2013-01-25SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Transportation
2013-01-24SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback