KS SB69 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring school districts to adopt policies against dating violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring school districts to adopt policies against dating violence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-01 Died in House Committee
2012-03-01 Referred to Committee on Education
2012-02-29 Received and Introduced
2012-02-23 Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2012-02-22 Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2012-02-22 Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2012-02-15 Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
2011-01-28 Referred to Committee on Education
2011-01-27 Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback