KS SB67 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permitting funeral escorts to direct traffic for funeral processions and requiring drivers to yield the right-of-way and move over for authorized utility or telecommunication vehicles.
Title
Permitting funeral escorts to direct traffic for funeral processions and requiring drivers to yield the right-of-way and move over for authorized utility or telecommunication vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 3 (Y: 119 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 99 Nay: 24 (Y: 99 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 3 (Y: 119 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 99 Nay: 24 (Y: 99 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2021-04-08 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 3 |
2021-04-08 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2021-03-24 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Proehl, Representative Delperdang and Representative Helgerson appointed as conferees |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Petersen , Senator Claeys and Senator Hawk as conferees |
2021-03-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 99 Nay: 24 |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2021-03-11 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 11, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-02-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-18 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 2, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate Introduced |