KS SB67 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - House Motion to Reconsider Failed Yea: 83 Nay: 41
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - House Motion to Reconsider Failed Yea: 83 Nay: 41
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring notification to patients that the effects of a medication abortion may be reversible.
Title
Requiring notification to patients that the effects of a medication abortion may be reversible.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House Motion to Reconsider Failed - Yea: 83 Nay: 41 (Y: 83 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained - Yea: 82 Nay: 43 (Y: 82 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Motion to override veto prevailed - Yea: 27 Nay: 13 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 26 Nay: 11 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 85 Nay: 35 (Y: 85 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained - Yea: 82 Nay: 43 (Y: 82 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Motion to override veto prevailed - Yea: 27 Nay: 13 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 26 Nay: 11 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 85 Nay: 35 (Y: 85 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | House Motion to Reconsider Failed Yea: 83 Nay: 41 |
2019-05-01 | House | House Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 82 Nay: 43 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 27 Nay: 13 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Vetoed by Governor; Returned to Senate on Monday, April 22, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 12, 2019 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 26 Nay: 11 |
2019-04-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 85 Nay: 35 |
2019-04-05 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2019-04-04 | House | House Representative Landwehr, Representative Eplee, and Representative Murnan are appointed to replace Representative Vickrey, Representative Cox, and Representative Neighbor on the Conference Committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Senator Suellentrop, Senator Berger, and Senator Bollier are appointed to replace Senator Olson, Senator Billinger, and Senator Ware on the Conference Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Vickrey, Representative Cox and Representative Neighbor appointed as conferees |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Olson , Senator Billinger and Senator Ware as conferees |
2019-03-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Vickrey was adopted |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Vickrey |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Insurance |
2019-03-18 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 212-N |
2019-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 212-N |
2019-03-07 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions; Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2019-02-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2019-02-28 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate Introduced |