KS SB67 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - House Motion to Reconsider Failed Yea: 83 Nay: 41
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring notification to patients that the effects of a medication abortion may be reversible.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring notification to patients that the effects of a medication abortion may be reversible.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - House Motion to Reconsider Failed - Yea: 83 Nay: 41 (Y: 83 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained - Yea: 82 Nay: 43 (Y: 82 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Motion to override veto prevailed - Yea: 27 Nay: 13 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 26 Nay: 11 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 85 Nay: 35 (Y: 85 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseHouse Motion to Reconsider Failed Yea: 83 Nay: 41
2019-05-01HouseHouse Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 82 Nay: 43
2019-05-01SenateSenate Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 27 Nay: 13
2019-05-01SenateSenate Vetoed by Governor; Returned to Senate on Monday, April 22, 2019
2019-05-01SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 12, 2019
2019-04-05SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 26 Nay: 11
2019-04-05HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 85 Nay: 35
2019-04-05HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2019-04-04HouseHouse Representative Landwehr, Representative Eplee, and Representative Murnan are appointed to replace Representative Vickrey, Representative Cox, and Representative Neighbor on the Conference Committee
2019-04-04SenateSenate Senator Suellentrop, Senator Berger, and Senator Bollier are appointed to replace Senator Olson, Senator Billinger, and Senator Ware on the Conference Committee
2019-04-01HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative Vickrey, Representative Cox and Representative Neighbor appointed as conferees
2019-03-27SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Olson , Senator Billinger and Senator Ware as conferees
2019-03-26HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Vickrey was adopted
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Vickrey
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Insurance
2019-03-18HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 212-N
2019-03-13HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 212-N
2019-03-07HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions; Referred to Committee on Insurance
2019-02-28HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
2019-02-28HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-02-27SenateSenate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-02-14SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-02-13SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-02-01SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-01-31SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb67/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb67_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb67_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb67_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190227104755_420385/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190326121151_230876/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190405172415_974862/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190405175750_586816/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190501111734_001520/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190501130305_844361/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190502113826_779953/

Bill Comments

feedback