KS SB65 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for Substitute for SB 65 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Regulation of the possession of firearms.
Title
House Substitute for Substitute for SB 65 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Regulation of the possession of firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 32 Nay: 7 (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Wolf was rejected - Yea: 10 Nay: 28 (Y: 10 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator O'Donnell was rejected - Yea: 14 Nay: 25 (Y: 14 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Longbine was rejected - Yea: 11 Nay: 26 (Y: 11 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 32 Nay: 7 (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Wolf was rejected - Yea: 10 Nay: 28 (Y: 10 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator O'Donnell was rejected - Yea: 14 Nay: 25 (Y: 14 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Longbine was rejected - Yea: 11 Nay: 26 (Y: 11 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Wolf was rejected - Yea: 10 Nay: 28 (Y: 10 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator O'Donnell was rejected - Yea: 14 Nay: 25 (Y: 14 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Longbine was rejected - Yea: 11 Nay: 26 (Y: 11 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 32 Nay: 7 (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Wolf was rejected - Yea: 10 Nay: 28 (Y: 10 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator O'Donnell was rejected - Yea: 14 Nay: 25 (Y: 14 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Longbine was rejected - Yea: 11 Nay: 26 (Y: 11 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died on House Calendar |
2016-03-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2016-03-10 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 15, 2016, 9:00 AM Room 346 |
2016-02-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2016-02-12 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 32 Nay: 7 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Wolf was rejected Yea: 10 Nay: 28 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Wolf |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator O'Donnell was rejected Yea: 14 Nay: 25 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator O'Donnell |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Longbine was rejected Yea: 11 Nay: 26 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Longbine |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Knox was adopted |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Knox |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 19, 2015, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senate Introduced |