KS SB62 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - House Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Substitute for SB 62 by Committee on Transportation - Allowing police vehicle drivers to engage in certain actions without using audible and visual signals and also allowing certain actions by drivers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substitute for SB 62 by Committee on Transportation - Allowing police vehicle drivers to engage in certain actions without using audible and visual signals and also allowing certain actions by drivers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 34 Nay: 4 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected - Yea: 9 Nay: 29 (Y: 9 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
2019-02-28HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-28HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-02-27SenateSenate Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 34 Nay: 4
2019-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
2019-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected Yea: 9 Nay: 29
2019-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey
2019-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Transportation
2019-02-07SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 7, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-02-01SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-31SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback