KS SB62 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending citizen grand jury petition sufficiency and right to appeal.
Title
Amending citizen grand jury petition sufficiency and right to appeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 22 Nay: 17 (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Not passed - Yea: 19 Nay: 21 (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Not passed - Yea: 19 Nay: 21 (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-09 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 09, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2017-02-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 22 Nay: 17 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Motion to Reconsider Adopted |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Not passed; Yea: 19 Nay: 21 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 02, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Introduced |