KS SB61 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amending podiatrist qualifications and scope of practice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending podiatrist qualifications and scope of practice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseHouse Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
2019-03-18HouseHouse Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders
2019-03-13HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2019-03-12HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
2019-02-28HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-02-28HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-02-27SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-25SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-02-11SenateSenate Hearing: Monday, February 11, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N
2019-02-01SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-01-31SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback