KS SB6 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Standardized law enforcement procedure to assess possession of firearms by an individual during routine stop.
Title
Standardized law enforcement procedure to assess possession of firearms by an individual during routine stop.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 21, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Senate Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, January 05, 2017 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb6/ |
Text | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb6_00_0000.pdf |