KS SB58 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - House Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 72 Nay: 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - House Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 72 Nay: 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the parents' bill of rights for parents of students attending elementary or secondary school in this state.
Title
Establishing the parents' bill of rights for parents of students attending elementary or secondary school in this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained - Yea: 72 Nay: 50 (Y: 72 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Motion to override veto prevailed - Yea: 27 Nay: 12 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 23 Nay: 15 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 67 Nay: 46 (Y: 67 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Motion to override veto prevailed - Yea: 27 Nay: 12 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 23 Nay: 15 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 67 Nay: 46 (Y: 67 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | House | House Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 72 Nay: 50 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 27 Nay: 12 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Vetoed by Governor; Returned to Senate on Friday, April 15, 2022 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 23 Nay: 15 |
2022-04-01 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 67 Nay: 46 |
2022-04-01 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Baumgardner, Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes appointed as second conferees |
2022-04-01 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Williams, Representative Hoffman and Representative Ousley appointed as second conferees |
2022-04-01 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2022-03-31 | House | House Representative Ousley is appointed to replace Representative Winn on the Conference Committee |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes are appointed to replace Senator Wilborn and Senator Haley on the Conference Committee |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Senator Baumgardner is appointed to replace Senator Warren on the Conference Committee |
2022-03-29 | House | House Representative Williams, Representative Hoffman, and Representative Winn are appointed to replace Representative Patton, Representative Ralph, and Representative Carmichael on the Conference Committee |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Senate Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn, and Senator Haley are appointed to replace Senator Tyson, Senator Alley, and Senator Holland on the Conference Committee |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Senator Tyson and Senator Alley are appointed to replace Senator Alley and Senator Claeys on the Conference Committee |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Senator Alley, Senator Claeys, and Senator Holland are appointed to replace Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn, and Senator Corson on the Conference Committee |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Senator Corson is appointed to replace Senator Haley on the Conference Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Patton, Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael appointed as conferees |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Warren , Senator Wilborn and Senator Haley as conferees |
2021-03-25 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-15 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 15, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-02-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 3, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate Introduced |