KS SB58 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Granting immunity from civil liability to the person who files a grand jury petition.
Title
Granting immunity from civil liability to the person who files a grand jury petition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 28 Nay: 11 (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 4, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2020-02-24 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-24 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 28 Nay: 11 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 23, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 22, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Introduced |