KS SB57 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring review of information technology contracts by the joint committee on information technology.
Title
Requiring review of information technology contracts by the joint committee on information technology.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb57/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb57_00_0000.pdf |