KS SB56 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 7, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 142-S - CANCELED
Pending: Senate Ethics, Elections and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring verification of certain hours billed by contractors under certain state contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring verification of certain hours billed by contractors under certain state contracts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 7, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 142-S - CANCELED
2019-01-31SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government
2019-01-30SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback