KS SB56 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, May 11, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, May 11, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 56 by Committee on Government, Technology and Security - Creating the Kansas cybersecurity act and revising membership of the information technology executive council.
Title
House Substitute for SB 56 by Committee on Government, Technology and Security - Creating the Kansas cybersecurity act and revising membership of the information technology executive council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 2 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 01, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 2 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-04-06 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 0 |
2018-04-06 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate Senator Hawk is appointed to replace Senator Kelly on the Conference Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Sloan, Representative Lewis and Representative Curtis appointed as conferees |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator McGinn , Senator Billinger and Senator Kelly as conferees |
2018-03-27 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2018-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Government, Technology and Security |
2018-03-19 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Elections; Referred to Committee on Government, Technology and Security |
2018-01-22 | House | House Hearing: Monday, January 22, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 281-N |
2017-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 13, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 281-N |
2017-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2017-02-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 01, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 142-S |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Introduced |