KS SB55 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Senate Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 26 Nay: 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creating the fairness in women's sports act to require that female student athletic teams only include members who are biologically female.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating the fairness in women's sports act to require that female student athletic teams only include members who are biologically female.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained - Yea: 26 Nay: 14 (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 26 Nay: 11 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 76 Nay: 43 (Y: 76 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Williams, Representative Huebert and Representative Stogsdill appointed as second conferees - Yea: 75 Nay: 42 (Y: 75 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateSenate Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 26 Nay: 14
2021-05-03SenateSenate Vetoed by Governor; Returned to Senate on Thursday, April 22, 2021
2021-05-03SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021
2021-04-09SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 26 Nay: 11
2021-04-08HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 76 Nay: 43
2021-04-08HouseHouse Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed
2021-04-08HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2021-04-08SenateSenate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Baumgardner, Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes appointed as second conferees
2021-04-08HouseHouse Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Williams, Representative Huebert and Representative Stogsdill appointed as second conferees Yea: 75 Nay: 42
2021-04-08HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2021-04-06HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative Williams, Representative Huebert and Representative Stogsdill appointed as conferees
2021-03-24SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Baumgardner , Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes as conferees
2021-03-24HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2021-03-18HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
2021-03-11HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 11, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 218-N
2021-03-10HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, March 10, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 218-N - CANCELED
2021-02-24HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Health and Human Services; Referred to Committee on Education
2021-02-10HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2021-02-10HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2021-02-09SenateSenate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2021-02-02SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2021-01-28SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, January 28, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
2021-01-22SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Public Health and Welfare; Referred to Committee on Education
2021-01-22SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2021-01-21SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/sb55/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb55_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb55_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb55_enrolled.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_sb55_h_1790.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/ccr_2021_sb55_h_2178.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/ccr_2021_sb55_h_2181.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fisc_note_sb55_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_sb55_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_sb55_01_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/ccrb_sb55_02_student_athletes.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/summary_sb_55_2021.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210209202906_746390/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210324112954_929948/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210408111346_277485/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210408234417_335249/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210409131949_168281/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210503123252_009862/

Bill Comments

feedback