KS SB55 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 7, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 7, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public construction contracts and performance and payment bonds.
Title
Public construction contracts and performance and payment bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Curtis was rejected - Yea: 48 Nay: 77 (Y: 48 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected - Yea: 13 Nay: 27 (Y: 13 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Motion challenging the ruling of the Rules Committee. Decision over-ruled. - Yea: 16 Nay: 24 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Curtis was rejected - Yea: 48 Nay: 77 (Y: 48 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected - Yea: 13 Nay: 27 (Y: 13 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Motion challenging the ruling of the Rules Committee. Decision over-ruled. - Yea: 16 Nay: 24 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 7, 2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 04, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Curtis was rejected Yea: 48 Nay: 77 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Curtis |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2017-03-22 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 22, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 112-N |
2017-03-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2017-03-17 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 1 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected Yea: 13 Nay: 27 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was withdrawn |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Motion challenging the ruling of the Rules Committee. Decision over-ruled. Yea: 16 Nay: 24 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Senator Lynn raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 07, 2017, 08:30 AM Room 548-S |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Introduced |