KS SB542 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a property tax revenue neutral rate complaint process, authorizing the county clerk to limit the amount of ad valorem taxes to be levied in certain circumstances, establishing a deadline for budgets to be filed with the director of accounts and reports and requiring roll call votes and publication of information.
Title
Establishing a property tax revenue neutral rate complaint process, authorizing the county clerk to limit the amount of ad valorem taxes to be levied in certain circumstances, establishing a deadline for budgets to be filed with the director of accounts and reports and requiring roll call votes and publication of information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 9, 2022, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Introduced |