KS SB52 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 9, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 9, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Sedgwick county urban area nuisance abatement act.
Title
Creating the Sedgwick county urban area nuisance abatement act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 80 Nay: 42 (Y: 80 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 29 Nay: 9 (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 29 Nay: 9 (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 9, 2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 30, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 80 Nay: 42 |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-03-24 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Local Government |
2021-03-17 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 17, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 281-N |
2021-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-02-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 29 Nay: 9 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hearing continuation: Thursday, January 28, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 142-S |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 26, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 142-S |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate Introduced |