KS SB52 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 19 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 19 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing chief engineer to allow augmentation to secure water.
Title
Authorizing chief engineer to allow augmentation to secure water.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 19 , 2015 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2015-04-29 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 0 |
2015-04-29 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2015-03-30 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Schwartz, Representative Boldra and Representative Victors appointed as conferees |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Powell , Senator Kerschen and Senator Francisco as conferees |
2015-03-25 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2015-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-03-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2015-03-06 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 12, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2015-02-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2015-02-23 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Natural Resources |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 29, 2015, 8:30 AM Room 159-S |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senate Introduced |