KS SB493 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - House No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - House No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting cities and counties from regulating plastic and other containers designed for the consumption, transportation or protection of merchandise, food or beverages.
Title
Prohibiting cities and counties from regulating plastic and other containers designed for the consumption, transportation or protection of merchandise, food or beverages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Motion to override veto prevailed - Yea: 27 Nay: 12 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments - Yea: 26 Nay: 12 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 74 Nay: 48 (Y: 74 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 27 Nay: 13 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments - Yea: 26 Nay: 12 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 74 Nay: 48 (Y: 74 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 27 Nay: 13 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | House | House No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 27 Nay: 12 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Vetoed by Governor; Returned to Senate on Monday, April 11, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 1, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments; Yea: 26 Nay: 12 |
2022-03-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 74 Nay: 48 |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2022-03-09 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 9, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2022-03-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2022-03-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 27 Nay: 13 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 17, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 546-S |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Introduced |