KS SB482 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that county clerks are not required to send revenue neutral rate notices to property owners of exempt property, modifying and prescribing the contents of the revenue neutral rate hearing notice, permitting a tax levy that generates the same amount of revenue as the previous year when the final assessed valuation decreases compared to the estimated assessed valuation and requiring that the governing body's vote be conducted on the same day as the commencement of the hearing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing that county clerks are not required to send revenue neutral rate notices to property owners of exempt property, modifying and prescribing the contents of the revenue neutral rate hearing notice, permitting a tax levy that generates the same amount of revenue as the previous year when the final assessed valuation decreases compared to the estimated assessed valuation and requiring that the governing body's vote be conducted on the same day as the commencement of the hearing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 32 Nay: 8 (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-30HouseHouse Died in House Committee
2024-03-18HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2024-03-18HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2024-03-14SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 32 Nay: 8
2024-03-14SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2024-03-14SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2024-02-21SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2024-02-15SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 15, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
2024-02-08SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2024-02-07SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback