KS SB482 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the firearm industry nondiscrimination act to prohibit certain government contracts with companies that discriminate against firearm entities and firearm trade associations.
Title
Enacting the firearm industry nondiscrimination act to prohibit certain government contracts with companies that discriminate against firearm entities and firearm trade associations.
Sponsors
Sen. Kellie Warren [R] | Sen. Larry Alley [R] | Sen. Renee Erickson [R] | Sen. Ty Masterson [R] |
Sen. Richard Wilborn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 21, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Introduced |