KS SB461 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reconciling amendments to certain statutes.
Title
Reconciling amendments to certain statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 14, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 07, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2018-05-02 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-05-02 | House | House Motion by Rep. Hineman to advance bill to Emergency Final Action Subject to Amendment and Debate adopted. |
2018-04-30 | House | House Referred to Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-30 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and referred to Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Introduced |