KS SB459 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the taxation study commission.
Title
Creating the taxation study commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, April 06, 2018, 05:00 PM Room 548-S |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb459/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb459_00_0000.pdf |