KS SB456 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a rebuttable presumption against retirement of fossil fuel-fired electric generating units, requiring the state corporation commission to report on such retirements and extending the timelines for the commission to make a determination regarding rate-making treatment for generating or transmission facilities.
Title
Establishing a rebuttable presumption against retirement of fossil fuel-fired electric generating units, requiring the state corporation commission to report on such retirements and extending the timelines for the commission to make a determination regarding rate-making treatment for generating or transmission facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 15, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 548-S |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Utilities |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Introduced |