KS SB454 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating exemptions in the open records act for election security records and cyber security records.
Title
Creating exemptions in the open records act for election security records and cyber security records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2020-03-17 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 11, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 142-S |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate Introduced |