KS SB450 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the school finance transportation weighting calculation to use density and per capita allowance.
Title
Amending the school finance transportation weighting calculation to use density and per capita allowance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 21, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 144-S |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Referred to Senate Select Committee on Education Finance |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb450/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb450_00_0000.pdf |