KS SB444 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for SB 444 by Committee on Ways and Means - Appropriations for FY 2022, FY 2023, FY 2024, FY 2025, FY 2026 and FY 2027 for various state agencies.
Title
Substitute for SB 444 by Committee on Ways and Means - Appropriations for FY 2022, FY 2023, FY 2024, FY 2025, FY 2026 and FY 2027 for various state agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 23 Nay: 14 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected - Yea: 16 Nay: 18 (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected - Yea: 10 Nay: 21 (Y: 10 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected - Yea: 16 Nay: 18 (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected - Yea: 10 Nay: 21 (Y: 10 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2022-03-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-17 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 23 Nay: 14 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected Yea: 16 Nay: 18 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was adopted |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected Yea: 10 Nay: 21 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was withdrawn |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 16, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Introduced |